NY S07806 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-17 - SIGNED CHAP.528
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Continues and expands New York's program for use of electronic means for filing certain papers in civil litigation in supreme court and other courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Continues and expands New York's program for use of electronic means for filing certain papers in civil litigation in supreme court and other courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-09-17 SIGNED CHAP.528
2010-09-07 DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2010-06-16 returned to senate
2010-06-16 passed assembly
2010-06-16 ordered to third reading rules cal.200
2010-06-16 substituted for a10987b
2010-06-14 referred to judiciary
2010-06-14 DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2010-06-14 PASSED SENATE
2010-06-08 AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 7806A
2010-05-25 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2010-05-24 2ND REPORT CAL.
2010-05-18 1ST REPORT CAL.576
2010-05-12 REFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A10987 (Same As) 2010-06-16 - substituted by s7806a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback