NY S07794 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a living allowance for adults with developmental disabilities; provides that a determination made pursuant to this section that the person is or is not developmentally disabled, as defined in subdivision twenty-two of section 1.03 of the mental hygiene law, shall not be binding on the state, a local government or the person for any other purpose, including determinations of eligibility for services authorized by the office for people with developmental disabilities.
Title
Relates to a living allowance for adults with developmental disabilities; provides that a determination made pursuant to this section that the person is or is not developmentally disabled, as defined in subdivision twenty-two of section 1.03 of the mental hygiene law, shall not be binding on the state, a local government or the person for any other purpose, including determinations of eligibility for services authorized by the office for people with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.110 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.371 |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | substituted for a8841 |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2022-01-25 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.161 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08841 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - substituted by s7794