NY S07784 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.106
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.106
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain temporary retail permits issued by the state liquor authority to licensees located in a municipality having a population of one million or more persons; provides that applicants in such a municipality applying for a temporary retail permit must file additional notice; provides conditions for operation under a temporary retail permit in a city with a population of one million or more.
Title
Relates to certain temporary retail permits issued by the state liquor authority to licensees located in a municipality having a population of one million or more persons; provides that applicants in such a municipality applying for a temporary retail permit must file additional notice; provides conditions for operation under a temporary retail permit in a city with a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.106 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.303 |
2022-01-25 | Assembly | substituted for a8699 |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2022-01-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.153 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08699 (Same As) 2022-01-25 - substituted by s7784