NY S07784 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the United States department of defense may appoint an eighth ad hoc member to the New York state board on electric generation siting and the environment, if a proposed electric generating facility is within seventy-five miles of an in-state military base.
Title
Provides that the United States department of defense may appoint an eighth ad hoc member to the New York state board on electric generation siting and the environment, if a proposed electric generating facility is within seventy-five miles of an in-state military base.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1292 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7784A |
2018-03-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2018-02-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10397 (Same As) 2018-04-19 - referred to energy