NY S07774 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.221
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.221
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven to transfer ownership of certain parklands to SMW Property Holdings.
Title
Authorizes the town of Brookhaven to transfer ownership of certain parklands to SMW Property Holdings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.221 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | home rule request |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.504 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | substituted for a10147b |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2016-06-06 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-06 | Senate | AMENDED 7774B |
2016-06-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1307 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7774A |
2016-05-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2016-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10147 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7774b