NY S07773 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - SIGNED CHAP.157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - SIGNED CHAP.157
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that a contractor making or taking a construction contract shall assume liability for any debt resulting from making a claim, owed to an employee, or third party on an employee's behalf, incurred by a subcontractor at any tier acting under, by, or for the contractor for an employee's performance of labor; provides for wage theft prevention and enforcement.
Title
Provides that a contractor making or taking a construction contract shall assume liability for any debt resulting from making a claim, owed to an employee, or third party on an employee's behalf, incurred by a subcontractor at any tier acting under, by, or for the contractor for an employee's performance of labor; provides for wage theft prevention and enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 117 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.157 |
2022-03-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.38 |
2022-02-07 | Assembly | substituted for a8769 |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2022-01-26 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-26 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.144 |
2022-01-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08769 (Same As) 2022-02-07 - substituted by s7773