NY S07773 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.544
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-01 - SIGNED CHAP.544
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts provisions providing sponsored group personal insurance and allows such insurance to be written by authorized insurers.
Title
Enacts provisions providing sponsored group personal insurance and allows such insurance to be written by authorized insurers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-01 | SIGNED CHAP.544 | |
2010-09-20 | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR | |
2010-06-22 | returned to senate | |
2010-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2010-06-22 | ordered to third reading rules cal.270 | |
2010-06-22 | substituted for a11268a | |
2010-06-22 | referred to insurance | |
2010-06-22 | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2010-06-22 | PASSED SENATE | |
2010-06-09 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING | |
2010-06-09 | AMENDED 7773A | |
2010-06-08 | 2ND REPORT CAL. | |
2010-06-07 | 1ST REPORT CAL.755 | |
2010-05-07 | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A11268 (Same As) 2010-06-22 - substituted by s7773a