NY S07772 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.322
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.322
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot program to conduct scientific research and assessment of the feasibility of seaweed cultivation.
Title
Establishes a pilot program to conduct scientific research and assessment of the feasibility of seaweed cultivation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.322 |
2016-08-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.366 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a10146a |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-09 | Senate | RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2016-06-08 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-07 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1515 |
2016-06-07 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7772A |
2016-06-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2016-05-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A10146 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s7772a