NY S07755 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - PRINT NUMBER 7755A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-16 - PRINT NUMBER 7755A
Pending: Senate Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Congregation Beis Medrash of Lawrence to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes the Congregation Beis Medrash of Lawrence to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7755A |
2022-05-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2022-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08888 (Same As) 2022-03-21 - enacting clause stricken
A10061 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES
A10061 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - REFERRED TO RULES