NY S07749 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Grants court officers in the town of Shelter Island in Suffolk county peace officer status.
Title
Grants court officers in the town of Shelter Island in Suffolk county peace officer status.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-09 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1114 |
2022-01-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08595 (Same As) 2022-05-04 - REFERRED TO CODES