NY S07749 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - SIGNED CHAP.501
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "protection of people with special needs act"; enacts various provisions for the protection of persons in state operated and licensed facilities from abuse, neglect and mistreatment; establishes the justice center for the protection of people with special needs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "protection of people with special needs act"; enacts various provisions for the protection of persons in state operated and licensed facilities from abuse, neglect and mistreatment; establishes the justice center for the protection of people with special needs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-12-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.501
2012-12-05SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.505
2012-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a10721
2012-06-20Assemblyreferred to codes
2012-06-20SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1405
2012-06-17SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10721 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s7749

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback