NY S07748 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-06 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to wireless communications equipment protection plans offered for sale by wireless communication equipment vendors; defines terms; requires certain notices and consumer protections.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to wireless communications equipment protection plans offered for sale by wireless communication equipment vendors; defines terms; requires certain notices and consumer protections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-06 - Senate - Senate Insurance Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-06Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2024-06-06Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.497
2024-06-06Assemblysubstituted for a8304b
2024-06-06Assemblyreferred to codes
2024-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-03SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 7748C
2024-05-21SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 7748B
2024-05-08SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-07Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-06Senate1ST REPORT CAL.883
2024-04-29SenatePRINT NUMBER 7748A
2024-04-29SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE
2023-11-13SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08304 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - substituted by s7748c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S7748
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07748&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07748
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07748&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07748A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07748&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07748B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07748&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07748C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S7748#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/S7748#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07748&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback