NY S07745 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-15 - SIGNED CHAP.351
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Onondaga Lake Amphitheater Infrastructure and Revitalization Project; provides for the construction of a performing arts amphitheater known as the "Onondaga Lake Amphitheater" located in the town of Geddes on the western shore of Onondaga Lake.
Title
Creates Onondaga Lake Amphitheater Infrastructure and Revitalization Project; provides for the construction of a performing arts amphitheater known as the "Onondaga Lake Amphitheater" located in the town of Geddes on the western shore of Onondaga Lake.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.351 |
2014-09-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.379 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a9964 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1479 |
2014-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09964 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s7745