NY S07730 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - signed chap.362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-23 - signed chap.362
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the authorization for the imposition of hotel/motel taxes in Otsego County from four to six percent.
Title
Increases the authorization for the imposition of hotel/motel taxes in Otsego County from four to six percent.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-23 | Senate | signed chap.362 |
2020-12-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.981 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7730 |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-10 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-10 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-10 | Senate | home rule request |
2020-06-10 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.134 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | rules report cal.134 |
2020-06-10 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-10 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10016 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.981 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10016 (Same As) 2020-12-23 - signed chap.362