NY S07720 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.434
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Enhances the criminal penalties for assaulting certain employees of a local social services district while in the performance of their duties; elevates it to assault in the second degree, a class D felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enhances the criminal penalties for assaulting certain employees of a local social services district while in the performance of their duties; elevates it to assault in the second degree, a class D felony.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.434
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.377
2012-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a4672d
2012-06-19Assemblyreferred to codes
2012-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1337
2012-06-15SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A04672 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - substituted by s7720

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback