NY S07719 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - referred to agriculture
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the aftercare of retired race horses; prohibits the slaughter of race horses and race horse breeding stock; requires that race horses be microchipped; provides for gifts for thoroughbred aftercare on tax returns.
Title
Relates to the aftercare of retired race horses; prohibits the slaughter of race horses and race horse breeding stock; requires that race horses be microchipped; provides for gifts for thoroughbred aftercare on tax returns.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Pamela Helming [R] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Racing, Gaming and Wagering Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2020-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-03-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-03-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.518 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
2020-02-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO DOMESTIC ANIMAL WELFARE |
Same As/Similar To
A09989 (Same As) 2020-03-04 - referred to agriculture