NY S07715 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on October 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CODES
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the court where there is criminal possession of stolen property to, in its discretion release the principal pending trial on the principal's own recognizance or under non-monetary conditions, fix bail, or order non-monetary conditions in conjunction with fixing bail, or, where the defendant is charged with a qualifying offense which is a felony, the court may commit the principal to the custody of the sheriff; makes related provisions.
Title
Authorizes the court where there is criminal possession of stolen property to, in its discretion release the principal pending trial on the principal's own recognizance or under non-monetary conditions, fix bail, or order non-monetary conditions in conjunction with fixing bail, or, where the defendant is charged with a qualifying offense which is a felony, the court may commit the principal to the custody of the sheriff; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-12-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7715A |
2023-12-01 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2023-10-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08855 (Same As) 2024-01-18 - referred to codes