NY S07713 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-05 - SIGNED CHAP.342
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes a patient's attending nurse practitioner to witness the patient's execution of a health care proxy; authorizes a nurse practitioner to act as a person's health care agent; authorizes an attending nurse practitioner to determine that a patient lacks capacity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes a patient's attending nurse practitioner to witness the patient's execution of a health care proxy; authorizes a nurse practitioner to act as a person's health care agent; authorizes an attending nurse practitioner to determine that a patient lacks capacity.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-05AssemblySIGNED CHAP.342
2018-10-24SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-13Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-13Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading cal.823
2018-06-13Assemblysubstituted for a10345a
2018-06-12Assemblyreferred to health
2018-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-05-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2018-05-02Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2018-05-02SenateAMENDED 7713B
2018-05-01Senate1ST REPORT CAL.981
2018-03-23SenatePRINT NUMBER 7713A
2018-03-23SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH
2018-02-09SenateREFERRED TO HEALTH

Same As/Similar To

A10345 (Same As) 2018-06-13 - substituted by s7713b

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07713&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07713&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07713
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07713&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07713A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07713&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07713B
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S7713#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S7713#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07713&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback