NY S07707 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes and directs the department of health and the office for the aging to conduct a study of fees and charges assessed to residents of assisted living facilities and to make recommendations to the legislature.
Title
Authorizes and directs the department of health and the office for the aging to conduct a study of fees and charges assessed to residents of assisted living facilities and to make recommendations to the legislature.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.643 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7707A |
2018-02-16 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO AGING |
2018-02-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
Same As/Similar To
A03061 (Same As) 2018-03-19 - REFERRED TO AGING