NY S07705 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10583A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-21 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10583A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends crossbow hunting provisions through 2014.
Title
Extends crossbow hunting provisions through 2014.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10583A |
2012-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1491 |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7705A |
2012-06-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2012-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10583 (Same As) 2012-12-17 - tabled