NY S07696 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-24 - SIGNED CHAP.71
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to pesticide use prohibited at certain children's camps.
Title
Relates to pesticide use prohibited at certain children's camps.
Sponsors
Sen. Samra Brouk [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.71 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.324 |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | substituted for a8733 |
2022-01-12 | Assembly | referred to health |
2022-01-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-01-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.24 |
2022-01-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08733 (Same As) 2022-01-31 - substituted by s7696