NY S07685 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on October 4 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Adjusts the school tax relief (STAR) exemption for homes located outside a city with a population greater than one million for the 2024--2025 school years and thereafter (Part A); relates to a real property tax freeze to reimburse qualifying homeowners for increases in local property taxes on their primary residences (Part B); provides for supplemental state assistance to be paid to cities, counties, towns and villages that are compliant with the property tax levy limits (Part C).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adjusts the school tax relief (STAR) exemption for homes located outside a city with a population greater than one million for the 2024--2025 school years and thereafter (Part A); relates to a real property tax freeze to reimburse qualifying homeowners for increases in local property taxes on their primary residences (Part B); provides for supplemental state assistance to be paid to cities, counties, towns and villages that are compliant with the property tax levy limits (Part C).

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-25SenateNOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO AGING
2023-12-11SenatePRINT NUMBER 7685B
2023-12-11SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2023-10-25SenatePRINT NUMBER 7685A
2023-10-25SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2023-10-04SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08313 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to real property taxation

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback