NY S07683 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the New York state low-income housing tax credit.
Title
Relates to the New York state low-income housing tax credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-14 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2018-03-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7683B |
2018-03-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-02-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7683A |
2018-02-21 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2018-02-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09954 (Same As) 2018-02-28 - referred to housing