NY S07679 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designates a portion of state route 77 between Broadway Road and Sumner Road in the town of Darien, county of Genesee, as the "Sgt Terry James Garigen Memorial Highway".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates a portion of state route 77 between Broadway Road and Sumner Road in the town of Darien, county of Genesee, as the "Sgt Terry James Garigen Memorial Highway".

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-06-07Assemblypassed assembly
2024-06-07Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.533
2024-06-07Assemblysubstituted for a8147a
2024-06-06Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2024-06-06SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-06SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-05-23SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-22Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-21Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1361
2024-05-02SenatePRINT NUMBER 7679A
2024-05-02SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
2023-10-02SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08147 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - substituted by s7679a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback