NY S07675 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.422
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for a period of probable usefulness for the payment of the past service cost by the city of Elmira to provide additional pension benefits to eligible firefighters employed by such city.
Title
Provides for a period of probable usefulness for the payment of the past service cost by the city of Elmira to provide additional pension benefits to eligible firefighters employed by such city.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 116 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.422 |
2014-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | home rule request |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.611 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a9898 |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2014-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1154 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-05-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09898 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - substituted by s7675