NY S07669 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Includes the Ogden Farmers' Library as an eligible library for the financing of projects through the dormitory authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Includes the Ogden Farmers' Library as an eligible library for the financing of projects through the dormitory authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Senate - Senate Libraries Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-30Assemblyreturned to senate
2024-05-30Assemblypassed assembly
2024-05-30Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.251
2024-05-30Assemblysubstituted for a8043a
2024-05-29Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2024-05-29SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-05-29SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-05-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2024-05-23Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2024-05-22Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1464
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO LIBRARIES
2023-11-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 7669A
2023-11-01SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES
2023-09-25SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A08043 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - substituted by s7669a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback