NY S07656 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Adirondack Coast Wine Trail".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system as the "Adirondack Coast Wine Trail".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2012-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1342 |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7656A |
2012-06-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2012-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10658 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - print number 10658a