NY S07655 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 22 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-22 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain towns to adopt a local law to provide that, real property whose interests or rights have been acquired for the purpose of the preservation of an open space or an open area may be partially exempt from local real property taxation, provided that the owner or owners of such real property enter into a conservation easement agreement with the municipality.
Title
Authorizes certain towns to adopt a local law to provide that, real property whose interests or rights have been acquired for the purpose of the preservation of an open space or an open area may be partially exempt from local real property taxation, provided that the owner or owners of such real property enter into a conservation easement agreement with the municipality.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-22 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2020-07-22 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2020-07-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.823 |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09732 (Same As) 2020-02-06 - referred to real property taxation