NY S07647 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - SIGNED CHAP.432
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes town of Ellicottville, county of Cattaraugus to transfer funds from an unappropriated fund balance for the construction of a highway garage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes town of Ellicottville, county of Cattaraugus to transfer funds from an unappropriated fund balance for the construction of a highway garage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-08-17AssemblySIGNED CHAP.432
2012-08-06SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-21Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-21Assemblyhome rule request
2012-06-21Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.553
2012-06-21Assemblysubstituted for a10637
2012-06-19Assemblyreferred to local governments
2012-06-19SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-19SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-19SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2012-06-19SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1327
2012-06-11SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10637 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7647

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback