NY S07641 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - APPROVAL MEMO.24
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "uniform notice of claim act"; establishes a uniform process and requirement for the filing of notices of claim prior to the commencement of a cause of action against any state or municipal entity, public authority or public benefit corporation.
Title
Enacts the "uniform notice of claim act"; establishes a uniform process and requirement for the filing of notices of claim prior to the commencement of a cause of action against any state or municipal entity, public authority or public benefit corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 120 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-17 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.24 |
2012-12-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.500 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.593 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a10657a |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2012-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-21 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-21 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1518 |
2012-06-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7641B |
2012-06-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2012-06-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7641A |
2012-06-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2012-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10657 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7641b