NY S07638 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.491
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a domestic violence fatality review team; adds members to the advisory council on domestic violence (part A); prohibits certain persons from controlling the disposition of a decedent's remains (part B); relates to the confidentiality program of the department of state (part C); relates to the consideration of certain factors when determining the issuance of an order of recognizance or bail and establishes the crime of aggravated domestic violence (part D); relates to a reasonable request to receive communications of health information by alternative means where disclosure could endanger a person (part E).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes a domestic violence fatality review team; adds members to the advisory council on domestic violence (part A); prohibits certain persons from controlling the disposition of a decedent's remains (part B); relates to the confidentiality program of the department of state (part C); relates to the consideration of certain factors when determining the issuance of an order of recognizance or bail and establishes the crime of aggravated domestic violence (part D); relates to a reasonable request to receive communications of health information by alternative means where disclosure could endanger a person (part E).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-25AssemblySIGNED CHAP.491
2012-10-15SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-12Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-12Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-12Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.144
2012-06-12Assemblysubstituted for a10624
2012-06-12Assemblyreferred to codes
2012-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1161
2012-06-08SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A10624 (Same As) 2012-06-12 - substituted by s7638

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback