NY S07611 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-27 - PRINT NUMBER 7611A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-27 - PRINT NUMBER 7611A
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of education to promulgate regulations to include school mental health practitioners in a certificate valid for pupil personnel services.
Title
Requires the commissioner of education to promulgate regulations to include school mental health practitioners in a certificate valid for pupil personnel services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7611A |
2016-05-27 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-05-23 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2016-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09938 (Same As) 2016-05-25 - reported referred to ways and means