NY S07601 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 31 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-12-31 - SIGNED CHAP.516
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for enhanced protection of water supplies from and emergency planning for terrorism and cyber terrorism attacks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for enhanced protection of water supplies from and emergency planning for terrorism and cyber terrorism attacks.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-12-31AssemblySIGNED CHAP.516
2016-12-31AssemblyAPPROVAL MEMO.32
2016-12-20SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2016-06-16Assemblyreturned to senate
2016-06-16Assemblypassed assembly
2016-06-16Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.503
2016-06-16Assemblysubstituted for a10129
2016-06-09Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2016-06-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2016-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2016-06-07SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2016-06-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2016-06-02Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1400
2016-05-23SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2016-05-11SenateREFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS

Same As/Similar To

A10129 (Same As) 2016-06-16 - substituted by s7601

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback