NY S07586 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Hempstead, county of Nassau, as the "Assemblyman Harvey Weisenberg Parkway".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the town of Hempstead, county of Nassau, as the "Assemblyman Harvey Weisenberg Parkway".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1275 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7586A |
2022-05-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-12-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |