NY S07564 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires approval by 2/3 vote of membership of the senate and assembly voting separately to increase or decrease any tax rate, impose a new state tax, extend or delete existing state tax.
Title
Requires approval by 2/3 vote of membership of the senate and assembly voting separately to increase or decrease any tax rate, impose a new state tax, extend or delete existing state tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-02-14 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2020-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A03538 (Same As) 2020-07-16 - held for consideration in governmental operations