NY S07562 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.606
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the claiming of credits under the empire state film production credit; provides for the application of certain provisions of the tax law related to the empire state film production credit and the empire state film post-production credit.
Title
Relates to the claiming of credits under the empire state film production credit; provides for the application of certain provisions of the tax law related to the empire state film production credit and the empire state film post-production credit.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.606 |
2023-10-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.747 |
2023-06-10 | Assembly | substituted for a7757 |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-08 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1832 |
2023-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07757 (Same As) 2023-06-10 - substituted by s7562