NY S07555 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - PRINT NUMBER 7555A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - PRINT NUMBER 7555A
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an official inspection station to post a sign or poster informing customers that it is not authorized to inspect an altered motor vehicle unless the registrant presents a state DOT exemption letter, otherwise such vehicle shall report to the Department of Transportation.
Title
Requires an official inspection station to post a sign or poster informing customers that it is not authorized to inspect an altered motor vehicle unless the registrant presents a state DOT exemption letter, otherwise such vehicle shall report to the Department of Transportation.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7555A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-12-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08460 (Same As) 2022-05-10 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION