NY S07544 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-18 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to reimbursing overturned traffic fines and requiring annual updates for police officers on local traffic laws.
Title
Relates to reimbursing overturned traffic fines and requiring annual updates for police officers on local traffic laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2018-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.609 |
2018-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09610 (Same As) 2018-01-26 - referred to transportation