NY S07543 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on December 21 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-12-21 - APPROVAL MEMO.97
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the legislative oversight of automated decision-making in government act (LOADinG Act) to regulate the use of automated decision-making systems and artificial intelligence techniques by state agencies.
Title
Enacts the legislative oversight of automated decision-making in government act (LOADinG Act) to regulate the use of automated decision-making systems and artificial intelligence techniques by state agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 113 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Internet And Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Internet And Technology Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-12-21 | Senate | APPROVAL MEMO.97 |
2024-12-21 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.674 |
2024-12-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.459 |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | substituted for a9430b |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | referred to science and technology |
2024-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-03 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 7543B |
2024-02-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-02-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.403 |
2024-01-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7543A |
2024-01-31 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INTERNET AND TECHNOLOGY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A09430 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - substituted by s7543b