NY S07541 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - SIGNED CHAP.605
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Facilitates the purchase by the state of New York mortgage agency of mortgages on manufactured homes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Facilitates the purchase by the state of New York mortgage agency of mortgages on manufactured homes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-10-25SenateSIGNED CHAP.605
2023-10-13SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-09Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.776
2023-06-09Assemblysubstituted for a7403a
2023-06-09Assemblyreferred to housing
2023-06-09SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-09SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-07SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1728
2023-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A07403 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - substituted by s7541

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback