NY S07538 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-12-22 - APPROVAL MEMO.93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the immediate incorporation of villages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the immediate incorporation of villages.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 86 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-12-22SenateAPPROVAL MEMO.93
2023-12-22SenateSIGNED CHAP.774
2023-12-12SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2023-06-10Assemblyreturned to senate
2023-06-10Assemblypassed assembly
2023-06-10Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.858
2023-06-10Assemblysubstituted for a7754
2023-06-08Assemblyreferred to local governments
2023-06-08SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2023-06-08SenatePASSED SENATE
2023-06-08SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1788
2023-06-05SenateREFERRED TO RULES

Same As/Similar To

A07754 (Same As) 2023-06-10 - substituted by s7538

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback