NY S07538 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-25 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8613
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions authorizing the city of Hudson to impose hotel and motel taxes.
Title
Extends provisions authorizing the city of Hudson to impose hotel and motel taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-25 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8613 |
2022-05-04 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.952 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2021-11-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08613 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - signed chap.404