NY S07532 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - signed chap.292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-27 - signed chap.292
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes William J. Cooley to receive service credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Title
Authorizes William J. Cooley to receive service credit under section 384-d of the retirement and social security law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-27 | Senate | signed chap.292 |
2020-11-18 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.979 |
2020-07-22 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7532 |
2020-06-09 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-06-09 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2020-06-09 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-06-09 | Senate | home rule request |
2020-06-09 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.89 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | rules report cal.89 |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported |
2020-06-09 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2020-06-06 | Senate | reference changed to ways and means |
2020-02-04 | Senate | referred to governmental employees |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9663 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.979 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09663 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - signed chap.292