NY S07525 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-28 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a utilization review of a request for nursing home care after an inpatient hospital admission to be completed within 24 hours of the request.
Title
Requires a utilization review of a request for nursing home care after an inpatient hospital admission to be completed within 24 hours of the request.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-28 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2020-02-27 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-26 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.486 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09086 (Same As) 2020-01-17 - referred to insurance