NY S07522 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A397B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A397B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits smoking at all times in facilities that provide child care services in a private home provided that such private home is required to be licensed or registered for child care services, regardless of whether or not children receiving such services are present.
Title
Prohibits smoking at all times in facilities that provide child care services in a private home provided that such private home is required to be licensed or registered for child care services, regardless of whether or not children receiving such services are present.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A397B |
2018-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-06-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1498 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7522A |
2018-05-24 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2018-01-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A00397 (Same As) 2018-08-20 - signed chap.201