NY S07514 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - SIGNED CHAP.489
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts medical malpractice insurance companies from provisions of law relating to the risk based financial standards applying to all property casualty insurance companies until December 31, 2016; extends certain prohibitions on requests for orders of rehabilitation or liquidation for medical malpractice insurance carriers until December 31, 2016.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts medical malpractice insurance companies from provisions of law relating to the risk based financial standards applying to all property casualty insurance companies until December 31, 2016; extends certain prohibitions on requests for orders of rehabilitation or liquidation for medical malpractice insurance carriers until December 31, 2016.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 138 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblySIGNED CHAP.489
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-18Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-18Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-18Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.331
2012-06-18Assemblysubstituted for a10432
2012-06-12Assemblyreferred to insurance
2012-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-12SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1159
2012-06-12SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2012-06-01SenatePRINT NUMBER 7514A
2012-06-01SenateAMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE
2012-05-30SenateREFERRED TO INSURANCE

Same As/Similar To

A10432 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - substituted by s7514a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback