NY S07504 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8445A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8445A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the county of Clinton, currently known as the Twin Bridges, as the "Trooper Brian S. Falb Memorial Bridge".
Title
Designates a portion of the state highway system in the county of Clinton, currently known as the Twin Bridges, as the "Trooper Brian S. Falb Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Stec [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8445A |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1366 |
2022-05-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7504A |
2022-05-02 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2021-11-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08445 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - signed chap.398