NY S07504 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.53
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes appropriations for the support of government - Capital Projects Budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Makes appropriations for the support of government - Capital Projects Budget.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-04-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 103 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-31 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-04-15AssemblyTHRU LINE VETO MEMO.53
2020-04-15AssemblyLINE VETO MEMO.36
2020-04-15AssemblySIGNED CHAP.54
2020-04-03SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2020-04-01Assemblyreturned to senate
2020-04-01Assemblypassed assembly
2020-04-01Assemblymessage of necessity - 3 day message
2020-04-01Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.18
2020-04-01Assemblysubstituted for a9504c
2020-04-01Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2020-03-31SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2020-03-31SenatePASSED SENATE
2020-03-31SenateMESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE
2020-03-31SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.633
2020-03-31SenatePRINT NUMBER 7504C
2020-03-31SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2020-03-31SenatePRINT NUMBER 7504B
2020-03-31SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2020-02-22SenatePRINT NUMBER 7504A
2020-02-22SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE
2020-01-22SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE

Same As/Similar To

A09504 (Same As) 2020-04-01 - substituted by s7504c

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07504&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07504&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07504
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07504&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07504A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07504&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S07504C
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S7504#SF1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S07504&term=2019&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2019/S7504#SC1

Bill Comments

feedback