NY S07500 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Operations Budget.
Title
Makes appropriations for the support of government - State Operations Budget.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 108 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-04-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-02 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | Assembly | THRU LINE VETO MEMO.8 |
2020-04-15 | Assembly | LINE VETO MEMO.1 |
2020-04-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.50 |
2020-04-03 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-04-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-04-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-04-02 | Assembly | message of necessity - 3 day message |
2020-04-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.23 |
2020-04-02 | Assembly | substituted for a9500c |
2020-04-02 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2020-04-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-04-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-04-02 | Senate | MESSAGE OF NECESSITY - 3 DAY MESSAGE |
2020-04-02 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.638 |
2020-04-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7500C |
2020-04-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-04-02 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7500B |
2020-04-02 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-02-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7500A |
2020-02-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2020-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09500 (Same As) 2020-04-15 - THRU LINE VETO MEMO.8