NY S07498 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - SIGNED CHAP.353
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Validates, ratifies and confirms certain bonds issued by the village of Dansville, in the county of Livingston, and authorizes issuance of further bonds to finance the objects and purposes of the validated bonds.
Title
Validates, ratifies and confirms certain bonds issued by the village of Dansville, in the county of Livingston, and authorizes issuance of further bonds to finance the objects and purposes of the validated bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.353 |
2012-07-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.592 |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a10522 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-20 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-06-20 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1390 |
2012-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10522 (Same As) 2012-06-21 - substituted by s7498